Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/19/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/19/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/19/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/25/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/09/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/09/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 02/09/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/15/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/14/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/14/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/14/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/14/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/30/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/30/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/12/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/12/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/03/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 08/01/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2011