Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/08/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/24/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/12/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/19/2012