Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/07/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/07/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/07/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 05/07/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/15/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/15/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/18/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/25/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/25/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/25/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/25/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/25/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/25/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/25/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/08/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/18/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/20/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/10/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/13/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/13/2012