Text: H.R.4965 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (09/20/2012)

Union Calendar No. 492

112th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4965

[Report No. 112–681]


To preserve existing rights and responsibilities with respect to waters of the United States, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
April 27, 2012

Mr. Mica (for himself, Mr. Rahall, Mr. Lucas, Mr. Peterson, Mr. Gibbs, and Mrs. Noem) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure

September 20, 2012

Additional sponsors: Mr. Shuster, Mr. Ribble, Mr. Rooney, Mr. Flake, Mr. Walden, Mr. Young of Alaska, Mr. Hanna, Mr. Schilling, Mr. Southerland, Ms. Jenkins, Mr. Graves of Missouri, Mr. Jones, Mr. Farenthold, Mr. Denham, Mr. Stutzman, Mr. Pompeo, Mr. Barrow, Mr. Schrader, Mr. Carter, Mr. Conaway, Mr. Tipton, Mr. Latta, Mr. Smith of Nebraska, Mr. Latham, Mr. Rogers of Kentucky, Mr. McIntyre, Mr. Luetkemeyer, Mr. Bishop of Georgia, Mr. Crawford, Mr. Lankford, Mr. Bishop of Utah, Mr. Cravaack, Mr. Hurt, Mr. Costa, Mr. Broun of Georgia, Mr. Nugent, Mrs. Ellmers, Mr. Cardoza, Mr. Kingston, Mr. Westmoreland, Mrs. Emerson, Mr. Cole, Mr. Heck, Mr. Stearns, Mr. Womack, Mr. Hastings of Washington, Mrs. Miller of Michigan, Mr. Price of Georgia, Mr. Costello, Mr. Graves of Georgia, Mr. Austin Scott of Georgia, Mr. Boren, Mr. Terry, Mr. Chandler, Mr. Kissell, Mr. Matheson, Mrs. Capito, Mr. Berg, Mr. Pearce, Mr. Fincher, Mr. Brady of Texas, Mr. Altmire, Mr. Kline, Mr. Bonner, Mr. Amodei, Mr. Schock, Mr. McClintock, Mr. Gosar, Mr. Posey, Mr. Palazzo, Mr. Marino, Mr. Cassidy, Mr. Huelskamp, Mr. Griffin of Arkansas, Mr. Duncan of South Carolina, Mr. Poe of Texas, Mr. King of Iowa, Mr. Bachus, Mr. Coffman of Colorado, Mr. Davis of Kentucky, Mr. Ross of Florida, Mr. Griffith of Virginia, Ms. Hochul, Mrs. Hartzler, Mrs. Bachmann, Mr. Donnelly of Indiana, Ms. Buerkle, Mr. Franks of Arizona, and Mr. Owens

September 20, 2012

Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed

[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic]


A BILL

To preserve existing rights and responsibilities with respect to waters of the United States, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Identification of waters protected by the Clean Water Act.

(a) In general.—The Secretary of the Army and the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency are prohibited from—

(1) finalizing, adopting, implementing, administering, or enforcing the proposed guidance described in the notice of availability and request for comments entitled “EPA and Army Corps of Engineers Guidance Regarding Identification of Waters Protected by the Clean Water Act” (EPA–HQ–OW–2011–0409) (76 Fed. Reg. 24479 (May 2, 2011)); and

(2) using the guidance described in paragraph (1), or any substantially similar guidance, as the basis for any decision regarding the scope of the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (33 U.S.C. 1251 et seq.) or any rulemaking.

(b) Rules.—The use of the guidance described in subsection (a)(1), or any substantially similar guidance, as the basis for any rule shall be grounds for vacating the rule.

SECTION 1. Identification of waters protected by the Clean Water Act.

(a) In general.—The Secretary of the Army and the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency are prohibited from—

(1) finalizing, adopting, implementing, administering, or enforcing the proposed guidance described in the notice of availability and request for comments entitled “EPA and Army Corps of Engineers Guidance Regarding Identification of Waters Protected by the Clean Water Act” (EPA–HQ–OW–2011–0409) (76 Fed. Reg. 24479 (May 2, 2011)); and

(2) using the guidance described in paragraph (1), any successor document, or any substantially similar guidance made publicly available on or after December 3, 2008, as the basis for any decision regarding the scope of the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (33 U.S.C. 1251 et seq.) or any rulemaking.

(b) Rules.—The use of the guidance described in subsection (a)(1), or any successor document or substantially similar guidance made publicly available on or after December 3, 2008, as the basis for any rule shall be grounds for vacating the rule.


Union Calendar No. 492

112th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 4965
[Report No. 112–681]

A BILL
To preserve existing rights and responsibilities with respect to waters of the United States, and for other purposes.

September 20, 2012
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed