Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/10/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/10/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/17/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/05/2011