Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/27/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/27/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/11/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/15/2012