Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/25/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/25/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/25/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/25/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/08/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/08/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 02/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/08/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/08/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/10/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/11/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/11/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/18/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/28/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/28/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/01/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/01/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/03/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/03/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/14/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/29/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/29/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/04/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/12/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/13/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/23/2011