Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/31/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/26/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/02/2012