Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/05/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/31/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/21/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2012