Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/10/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/10/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/30/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/06/2012