Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/26/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/02/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/06/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/06/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/14/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/20/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/18/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/31/2012