Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/09/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/11/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/11/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 02/11/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/14/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/15/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/18/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/05/2011