Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/14/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/10/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/23/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/06/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/06/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/08/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/08/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/16/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/27/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/27/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/29/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/18/2012