Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/28/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/05/2011