Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/10/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/10/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/17/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/06/2011