Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/17/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/30/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/31/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/01/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/07/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/12/2012