Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/27/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/08/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/01/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/01/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/13/2012