Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/13/2011