Committees: H.R.527 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/08/2011 Referred to
07/07/2011 Markup by
11/29/2011 Reported by House Report 112-289,Part 1
House Report 112-289,Part 3
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law02/09/2011 Referred to
02/10/2011 Hearings by
07/01/2011 Discharged from
House Small Business02/08/2011 Referred to
11/16/2011 Reported by House Report 112-289,Part 2
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/05/2011 Referred to