Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/27/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/15/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/21/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/23/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/01/2012