Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/08/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/13/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/11/2012