Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/09/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/14/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/17/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/17/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/02/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/02/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/02/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/12/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/13/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/23/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/23/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/18/2011