Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/01/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/18/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2012