Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 02/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/14/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/18/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/01/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/01/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/11/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/11/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/16/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/16/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/16/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/06/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/06/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/24/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/16/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/05/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/16/2012