Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/08/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/09/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/10/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/07/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/24/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/27/2012