Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/10/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/10/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/10/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/10/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/11/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/15/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/17/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/28/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/03/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/10/2011