Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/07/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/18/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/19/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/28/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/29/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/29/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/09/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/09/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/09/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/10/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/11/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/12/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/17/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/23/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/23/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/01/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/14/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/19/2012