Text: H.R.558 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 558

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Big Spring, Texas, as the George H. O’Brien, Jr., Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
February 8, 2011

Mr. Neugebauer introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs


A BILL

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Big Spring, Texas, as the George H. O’Brien, Jr., Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Findings.

Congress makes the following findings:

(1) George H. O’Brien, Jr., was born on September 10, 1926, in Fort Worth, Texas.

(2) O’Brien served as a seaman in the United States Merchant Marine during the period beginning in December 1944 and ending in May 1946.

(3) While attending college at the Texas Technological College (now known as “Texas Tech University”), O’Brien enlisted in the United States Marine Corps Reserve in July 1949.

(4) After graduating from college in 1950, O’Brien was ordered to active duty and departed for Korea in September 1952.

(5) Following his discharge from the service, O’Brien settled in Big Spring, Texas, to raise his family.

(6) O’Brien often participated in volunteer programs at the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Big Spring, Texas.

(7) O’Brien was awarded the Medal of Honor, the highest honor in the United States awarded for valor to members of the Armed Forces, for his actions during the Battle for the Hook, on October 27, 1952, in Korea for conspicuous gallantry and intrepidity at the risk of his life above and beyond the call of duty as a rifle platoon commander of Company H, 3d Battalion, 7th Marines, 1st Marine Division (Reinforced).

(8) Although wounded several times during intense fighting to regain a vitally important hill position on the main line of resistance, then-Second Lieutenant O’Brien bravely led his platoon into deadly small arms, artillery, and mortar fire against a numerically superior force.

(9) During the battle, O’Brien repeatedly engaged the enemy at close range, killing at least 3 enemy soldiers, eventually securing the position until relieved.

(10) In addition to being awarded the Medal of Honor during his service in Korea, O’Brien received 2 Purple Heart Medals for wounds received during combat, the Korean Service Medal with 2 bronze stars, the United Nations Service Medal, and several other military honors.

(11) O’Brien was awarded the Medal of Honor personally by President Dwight D. Eisenhower and is the only Medal of Honor recipient from Big Spring, Texas.

(12) Upon his release from the United States Marine Corps, O’Brien began a career as a petroleum geologist in Texas and served on the Marine Corps Scholarship Foundation and the Medal of Honor Society.

(13) O’Brien died on March 11, 2005, in Midland, Texas.

SEC. 2. George H. O’Brien, Jr., Department Of Veterans Affairs Medical Center.

(a) Designation.—The Department of Veterans Affairs medical center located in Big Spring, Texas, shall be known and designated as the “George H. O’Brien, Jr., Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center”.

(b) References.—Any reference in a law, map, regulation, document, paper, or other record of the United States to the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center referred to in subsection (a) shall be deemed to be a reference to the “George H. O’Brien, Jr., Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center”.