Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/04/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/06/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/14/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/24/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/12/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/27/2011