Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/08/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/08/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/08/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/08/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/08/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/10/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/15/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/18/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/31/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/19/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/21/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/21/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/11/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/11/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/12/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/18/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/23/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/20/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/05/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/05/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2012