There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Password Protection Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit employers from compelling or coercing any person to authorize access to a protected computer, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/09/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/04/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/09/2012Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/09/2012
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/18/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/25/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/26/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/09/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/09/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/10/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/17/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/17/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/25/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/31/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary05/09/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/04/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5684. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/09/2012)

Password Protection Act of 2012 - Amends the federal criminal code to subject to a fine any employer who knowingly and intentionally: (1) compels or coerces any person to provide the employer with a password or similar information to access a protected computer not owned by such employer; or (2) discharges, disciplines, discriminates, or threatens to take such actions, against any person who fails to authorize access to such computer, has filed a complaint or instituted a proceeding regarding such action, or testified or is about to testify in any such proceeding.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to limit the authority of a court of competent jurisdiction to grant equitable relief in a civil action, if the court believes that the information sought to be obtained is relevant to protecting the intellectual property, a trade secret, or confidential business information of the party seeking relief.

Exempts an employer's actions from such prohibition if: (1) the employer discharges or disciplines an individual for good cause; (2) a state enacts a law that specifically waives such prohibition with respect to a particular class of state or agency employees and the employer's action relates to an employee in such class; or (3) an executive agency, military department, or other executive branch entity specifically waives the prohibition with respect to a particular class of employees who may have access to classified information.