Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/09/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/18/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/25/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/26/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/09/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/09/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/10/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/17/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/17/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/25/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/31/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012