Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/23/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/19/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/05/2012