Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/12/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/12/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/23/2012