Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/09/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/15/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/28/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/18/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/23/2012