There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment of a Tomb of Remembrance at Arlington National Cemetery for interment of cremated fragments of the remains of members of the Armed Forces killed in Afghanistan, Iraq, or a subsequent conflict when the fragments are unidentifiable by use of DNA testing or other means because of the condition of the fragments, are unclaimed, or are identified and authorized by the person designated to direct disposition of the remains for internment in such memorial.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
07/10/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/27/2012Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
06/27/2012Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
06/06/2012Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
05/29/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/10/2012Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2012Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/10/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/10/2012 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/10/2012 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/10/2012 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/29/2012 Referred to
06/06/2012 Hearings by
06/27/2012 Markup by
06/27/2012 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5735.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5735. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2012)

Directs the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to establish within Arlington National Cemetery a Tomb of Remembrance for the interment of cremated fragments of the remains of members of the Armed Forces killed in Afghanistan, Iraq, or any subsequent war or contingency operation if such fragments are: (1) unidentifiable by use of DNA testing or other means, (2) unclaimed after a reasonable period, (3) identified and authorized for such interment by the person designated to direct disposition, or (4) designated as "No Further Pursuit" remains.