There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 15285 Samohin Drive in Macomb, Michigan, as the "Lance Cpl. Anthony A. DiLisio Clinton-Macomb Carrier Annex".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/28/2012Became Public Law No: 112-223. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2012Signed by President.
12/21/2012Presented to President.
12/19/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2012Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8230)
11/28/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6479)
05/11/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/28/2012Became Public Law No: 112-223. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2012Signed by President.
12/21/2012HousePresented to President.
12/20/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2012SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8230)
12/06/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
11/29/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/28/2012-1:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2012-1:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6479)
11/28/2012-1:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5738.
11/28/2012-1:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6479-6480)
11/28/2012-1:42pmHouseMr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/20/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/27/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/27/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/11/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/11/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/11/2012 Referred to
06/27/2012 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/29/2012 Referred to
12/19/2012 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security12/06/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5738.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5738. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-223 (12/28/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 15285 Samohin Drive in Macomb, Michigan, as the "Lance Cpl. Anthony A. DiLisio Clinton-Macomb Carrier Annex."