Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/11/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/11/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/11/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 05/11/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 05/11/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/31/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/05/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2012