Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/15/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 05/15/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 06/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/24/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/02/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/12/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/12/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/14/2012