Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/02/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/26/2012