Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/2012