There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Outreach to People With Disabilities During Emergencies Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Outreach to People With Disabilities During Emergencies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to provide guidance and coordination for outreach to people with disabilities during emergencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/21/2012Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
12/21/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-719, Part I.
05/17/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
12/21/2012Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2012Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-719, Part I.
08/01/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/01/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/06/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/18/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/17/2012Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2012Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/29/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/17/2012 Referred to
08/01/2012 Markup by
12/21/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-719
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management05/18/2012 Referred to
House Homeland Security05/17/2012 Referred to
12/21/2012 Discharged from
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications06/06/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5806. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/21/2012)

Outreach to People With Disabilities During Emergencies Act - Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), through the Disability Coordinator, in order to enhance domestic preparedness for a natural disaster, act of terrorism, or other man-made disaster, to provide guidance to and coordinate with appropriate individuals, officials, and organizations for outreach to people with disabilities during such an event.