Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/28/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/24/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/24/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/13/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/13/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/14/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/21/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/21/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/21/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/28/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/28/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/05/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/14/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/14/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/27/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 11/28/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/30/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/03/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/05/2012