Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/18/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/01/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2012