Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/09/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/15/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/24/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/07/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/25/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/25/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/01/2012