Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 05/18/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/07/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/28/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/16/2012