Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/08/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/08/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/21/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/21/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/21/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/21/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/21/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/21/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/17/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/17/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/17/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/13/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/13/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/14/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/21/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/21/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/21/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/02/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/02/2012