Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 05/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/30/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/15/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 06/19/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/28/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/17/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/07/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/11/2012