Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/31/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 05/31/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 05/31/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/31/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/05/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/06/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/08/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/08/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/08/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/20/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2012