There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Forest Products Fairness Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to modify the definition of the term "biobased product".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/31/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/27/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/01/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3365-3366)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/31/2012Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/31/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/31/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/31/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/01/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/07/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/27/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/31/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/31/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/27/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/31/2012 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry06/27/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5873. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/31/2012)

Forest Products Fairness Act of 2012 - Amends the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to include in the definition of "biobased product" forest products that meet biobased content requirements, notwithstanding the market share the product holds, the product's age, or whether the market for the product is new or emerging.

Defines "forest product" as a product made from materials derived from the practice of forestry or the management of growing timber, including: (1) pulp, paper, paperboard, pellets, and wood products; and (2) any recycled products derived from forest materials.